Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Luis García Jasso

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1973 Born
10 Jun 200632.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of México, Federal District
5 May 200733.6Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
3 Jul 202147.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
3 Jul 202147.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
24 Aug 202147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Andrés Luis García Jasso
Bishop Andrés Luis García Jasso (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuevo Laredo, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas
Ordained DeaconNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained PriestNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2021
  • od/loc: CB, 3 Jul 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Aug 2021
  • c34: CB, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast