Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Texcoco

Dioecesis Texcocensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 30 April 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: México
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 1,131 (436 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Metro-Circundante
  • Web Site: http://dioctex.cem.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Fray Pedro de Gante 2, 56100 Texcoco, Méx., México
  • Telephone: (595)954-20-89
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
30 April 1960ErectedArchdiocese of México (Acolman, Amecameca, Apaxco, Ateneo (San Salvador), Atlautla, Axapusco, Ayapango, Coacalco, Cocotitlan, Chiautla, Chalco, Chicolopan, Chiconcuac, Chimalhacan, Ecatepec, Morelos, Ecatzingo, Hueypoxtla, Ixtapaluca, Jaltengo, Juchitepec, Melchor Ocampo, ...) Diocese of Texcoco (erected)
13 January 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of México (Coyotepec, Cuautitlan, Chapa de Mota, Huehuetoca, Huixquilucan, Iturbide, Jilotepec, Jilotzingo, Naucalpan, Nicolas Romero, Soyaniquilpan, Teoloyucan, Tepotzotlan, Tlalnepantla, Tultitlan, Villa del Carbon, and Zaragoza)
Diocese of Texcoco (Coacalco)
Diocese of Tlalnepantla (erected)
5 February 1979Territory LostDiocese of Tlalnepantla (Coacalco, Coyotepec, Chapa de Mota, Cuautitlán, Cuautitlán Izcalli, Huehuetoca, Nicolás Romero, Teoloyucan, Tepozotlán, Tultitlán, and Villa del Carbon)
Diocese of Texcoco (Apaxco, Hueypoxtla, Melchor Ocampo, Nextlalpan, Tequisquiac, Tultepec, Xaltengo, and Zumpango)
Diocese of Cuautitlán (erected)
5 February 1979Territory LostDiocese of Texcoco (Amecameca, Atlahutla, Ayapango, Cocotitlán, Chalco, Ecatzingo, Ixtapaluca, Juchitepec, La Paz - Los Reyes, Netzahualcóyotl, Ozumba, Temamatla, Tenango del Aire, Tepetlixpa, and Tlalmanalco) Diocese of Netzahualcóyotl (erected)
17 June 1989Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Texcoco (from México)
28 June 1995Territory LostDiocese of Texcoco (Ecatepec de Morelos)
Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla (Isla Municipal de Ixhuatepec)
Diocese of Ecatepec (erected)
3 December 2008Territory LostDiocese of Texcoco (Tecamac, Acolman, Teotihuacan, Axapusco, Nopaltepec, Otumba, San Martín de las Pirámides, and Temascalapa) Diocese of Teotihuacán (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966487,200500,06897.4%5510657,4951319157ap1967
1970882,019904,85597.5%68188610,2561821253ap1971
19761,621,2491,666,41597.3%913612712,7655222266ap1977
1980950,0001,000,00095.0%65188311,4453922545ap1981
19902,567,0002,790,00092.0%123813119,59520820587ap1991
19992,601,0003,060,00085.0%1281814617,815242727270ap2000
20002,907,3913,114,00093.4%1211914020,767243428170ap2001
20012,907,3913,114,00093.4%1292014919,512143125675ap2002
20022,967,4913,176,20093.4%1362416018,546244829977ap2003
20032,958,7063,239,72491.3%1481616418,040241625780ap2004
20043,010,7923,304,51891.1%1521516718,028241526983ap2005
20101,442,5341,605,00089.9%1121512711,358713021860ap2011
20141,209,1691,427,91584.7%126131398,699711317748ap2015
20171,236,5031,354,87291.3%129241538,081618018753ap2018
20201,273,6001,395,50091.3%124231478,663311519760ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 20, to Page 22
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 81, Page 1,085, and Page 1,086

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 15 Aug 2023