Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Luc Gérard Garin

Bishop of Saint-Claude, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1969 Born
29 Jun 199626.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lille, France
29 Jun 199727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
10 Dec 202051.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
14 Feb 202151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Luc Gérard Garin (VIAF: 149474204)
Bishop Jean-Luc Gérard Garin (born ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Bassée, Diocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sauveur, Church, Lille, Diocese of Lille
Ordained PriestSaint-Sauveur, Church, Lille, Diocese of Lille
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Claude, Diocese of Saint-Claude

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Claude.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Dec 2020
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast