Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Galván Castillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Autlán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1951Born
17 Jul 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
26 Oct 200453.7AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
14 Dec 200453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
25 Jun 201564.4ResignedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
22 Nov 202069.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Autlán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Galván Castillo
Bishop Gonzalo Galván Castillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Autlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of León, Guanajuato
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Near, Cathedral, Autlán, Diocese of Autlán, Jalisco
Death PlaceLeón, Archdiocese of León, Guanajuato

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,727
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2015
  • d: CB, 23 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast