Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Frosi (Frozi), S.X. †

Deceased

Bishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1924Born
6 May 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
2 Feb 197046.0AppointedPrelate of Abaeté do Tocantins, Para, Brazil
2 Feb 197046.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnetum
1 May 197046.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnetum
26 May 197854.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Magnetum
17 Sep 198157.6AppointedBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil
28 Jun 199571.4DiedBishop of Abaetetuba, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Angelo Frosi (Frozi)
Bishop Angelo Frosi (Frozi) S.X. (born , died ) Bishop of Abaetetuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano, Italy
Ordained BishopPlaza in front of, Cathedral, Abaeté do Tocantins, Territorial Prelature of Abaeté do Tocantins, Para

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 502
  • obd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast