Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Frison

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Odessa, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1875Born
22 Nov 190227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tiraspol, Moldova
10 May 192651.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Odessa, Ukraine
10 May 192651.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
10 May 192651.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
2 Aug 193762.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Odessa, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Frison
Bishop Aleksander Frison (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Odessa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaden
Ordained BishopSaint Louis des Français, Moscou

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 28
  • b: CB, 29 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,515
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast