Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tiraspol

Dioecesis Tiraspolitana

Suppressed

To: Diocese of San Clemente a Saratov



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cherson
3 July 1848ErectedDiocese of Cherson (erected)
Diocese of Tiraspol
1852Name ChangedDiocese of Cherson Diocese of Tiraspol
10 March 1926Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev
Diocese of Tiraspol
Apostolic Administration of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk (erected)
10 May 1926Territory LostDiocese of Tiraspol Apostolic Administration of Caucasus (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Odessa (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Russia (Armenian) (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Tiflis and Georgia (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Volga (erected)
28 October 1993Territory LostApostolic Administration of Caucasus (suppressed)
Diocese of Iaşi
Apostolic Administration of Odessa (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Russia (Armenian) (suppressed)
Diocese of Tiraspol
Apostolic Administration of Tiflis and Georgia (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Volga (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Moldova (erected)
11 February 2002SuppressedApostolic Administration of Southern European Russia {Russia Europea Meridionale}
Diocese of Tiraspol (suppressed)
Diocese of San Clemente a Saratov

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast