Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Forristal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1931Born
21 Dec 195524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
3 Dec 197948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
3 Dec 197948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
20 Jan 198048.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
30 Jun 198150.0AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
14 Sep 200776.2RetiredBishop of Ossory, Ireland
10 Oct 201887.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Laurence Forristal
Bishop Laurence Forristal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJerpoint Church, Thomastown
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceSt. Luke's, Hospital, Kilkenny

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2007
  • d: CB, 10 Oct 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,685

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast