Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph A. Carroll

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Quaestoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1912Born
19 Jun 193825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
4 Oct 196855.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
4 Oct 196855.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
10 Dec 196855.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
15 Jun 198976.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
29 Feb 199279.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph A. Carroll
Bishop Joseph A. Carroll (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 46
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast