Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Artemio Flores Calzada

Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1949 Born
17 Oct 197425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Texcoco, México, México
8 Jul 200354.1AppointedBishop of Valle de Chalco, México, México
8 Sep 200354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valle de Chalco, México, México
30 Mar 201262.9AppointedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Artemio Flores Calzada
Bishop Luis Artemio Flores Calzada (born ) Bishop of Tepic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio Tultitlán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tepic.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,454
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast