Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael William Fisher

Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1958 Born
23 Jun 199032.3Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
8 Jun 201860.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
8 Jun 201860.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Truentum
29 Jun 201860.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Truentum
1 Dec 202062.7AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
15 Jan 202162.8InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael William Fisher
Bishop Michael William Fisher (born ) Bishop of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestSt. Mathew's, Cathedral, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopNational Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buffalo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2018
  • ob/c12: CB, 8 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,800
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast