Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adam Joseph Exner, O.M.I.

Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1928 Born
7 Jul 195728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Jan 197445.0AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
12 Mar 197445.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
28 Mar 197445.2InstalledBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
31 Mar 198253.2AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
23 Jun 198253.4InstalledArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
25 May 199162.4AppointedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
10 Jan 200475.0RetiredArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Adam Joseph Exner (VIAF: 18629219)
Archbishop Adam Joseph Exner O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaly
Ordained BishopCenter of Arts, Regina, Archdiocese of Regina, Saskatchewan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vancouver.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast