Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Narciso de Esténaga y Echevarría

Deceased

Prelate of Ciudad Real, Spain

Titular Bishop of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1882Born
1907¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
14 Dec 192240.1AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
14 Dec 192240.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
22 Jul 192340.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
22 Aug 193653.8DiedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
28 Oct 2007Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Narciso de Esténaga y Echevarría
Bishop Bl. Narciso de Esténaga y Echevarría (born , died ) Prelate of Ciudad Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño
Ordained BishopLa Milagrosa, Church, Madrid, Diocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 39
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,465

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast