Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Bilbao y Ugarriza

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1873Born
12 Jun 189724.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 192450.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tortosa, Spain
23 Apr 192450.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
27 Dec 192451.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
14 Dec 192552.5AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
18 Nov 194370.5DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Félix Bilbao y Ugarriza
Bishop Félix Bilbao y Ugarriza (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaquio
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 76
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast