Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Escobar Aristizábal

Bishop Emeritus of Girardot, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1939 Born
15 Aug 196324.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 198243.2AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
14 Aug 198243.5Ordained BishopBishop of Girardot, Colombia
17 Sep 198748.6ResignedBishop of Girardot, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Escobar Aristizábal
Bishop Rodrigo Escobar Aristizábal (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Girardot

EventPlace
Birth PlacePensilvania
Ordained BishopN.D. du Rosaire, Manizales, Archdiocese of Manizales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girardot.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast