Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Dumond, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

Titular Bishop of Curubis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1864Born
5 Apr 188521.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
10 Aug 188824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Apr 191248.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo}, China
27 Apr 191248.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Curubis
30 Jun 191248.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curubis
21 Jul 192056.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo}, China
21 Jul 192056.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kanchow [Ganzhou], China
12 May 192561.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kanchow [Ganzhou], China
3 Jul 193167.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
19 Feb 194479.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Dumond
Bishop Paul-Marie Dumond C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceKioukiang

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 42
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast