Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Vincent Dudley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1926Born
2 Jun 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
9 Nov 197649.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
9 Nov 197649.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
25 Jan 197750.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
6 Nov 197851.9AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
13 Dec 197852.0InstalledBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
21 Mar 199568.3RetiredBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
20 Nov 200679.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Vincent Dudley
Bishop Paul Vincent Dudley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorthfield
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 31 Dec 2020

Quantcast