Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carroll Thomas Dozier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Memphis, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1911Born
19 Mar 193725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
12 Nov 197059.2AppointedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
6 Jan 197159.3Ordained BishopBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
27 Jul 198270.9ResignedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
7 Dec 198574.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Memphis, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Carroll Thomas Dozier (VIAF: 78364467)
Bishop Carroll Thomas Dozier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Memphis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMemphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee
Death PlaceMemphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee
Buried Place (Original)Calvary, Cemetery, Memphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee
Buried Place (Current)Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Memphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast