Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano De Nicolò

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1932Born
9 Apr 195523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
8 Jul 198957.4AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
8 Jul 198957.4AppointedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
23 Sep 198957.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
25 May 199563.3ResignedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
3 Jul 200775.4RetiredBishop of Rimini, Italy
11 Apr 202088.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano De Nicolò
Bishop Mariano De Nicolò (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCattolica, Diocese of Rimini
Ordained PriestCattolica, Diocese of Rimini
Ordained BishopTempio Malatestiano, Cathedral, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini
Death PlaceMontetauro, Diocese of Rimini
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,471
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 11 Apr 2020
  • loc: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast