Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boniface Nyema Dalieh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cape Palmas, Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1933Born
11 Jul 196531.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Palmas, Liberia
17 Dec 197340.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia
17 Dec 197340.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
17 Mar 197440.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talaptula
19 Dec 198148.0AppointedBishop of Cape Palmas, Liberia
15 Oct 200874.8RetiredBishop of Cape Palmas, Liberia
25 Apr 201480.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cape Palmas, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Boniface Nyema Dalieh
Bishop Boniface Nyema Dalieh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cape Palmas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePleebo
Ordained BishopCape Palmas, Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Palmas

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 1 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast