Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Touably Youlo

Bishop of Agboville, Côte d’Ivoire

Apostolic Administrator of Yamoussoukro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1959 Born
8 Aug 198727.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
199232.1IncardinatedPriest of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire
14 Oct 200646.9AppointedBishop of Agboville, Côte d’Ivoire
16 Dec 200647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agboville, Côte d’Ivoire
19 Jun 201858.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Alexis Touably Youlo
Bishop Alexis Touably Youlo (born ) Bishop of Agboville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBéréblo
Ordained Bishopplace des grands évènements en face du Lycée Moderne, Agboville, Diocese of Agboville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Agboville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • c2/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,300
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast