Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristian Dumitru Crişan

Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Abula

Titular See: (Western Europe/Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1981 Born
11 May 200826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
9 Apr 201836.4AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
22 Jan 202038.2ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
22 Jan 202038.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
21 Jun 202038.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula

MicroData Summary for Cristian Dumitru Crişan (VIAF: 316767517)
Bishop Cristian Dumitru Crişan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReghin-Mures, Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
Ordained PriestBucarest
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Blaj

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2018
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 21 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Jun 2020

Quantcast