Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Cleary, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1925Born
29 Jun 195226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Jan 198155.3AppointedBishop of Banjul, Gambia
25 Mar 198155.5Ordained BishopBishop of Banjul, Gambia
25 Feb 200680.4RetiredBishop of Banjul, Gambia
3 Sep 202095.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Cleary
Bishop Michael Joseph Cleary C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banjul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTulrahan
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, Banjul, Diocese of Banjul
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2006
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • mn: CB, 1 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,292
  • d: CB, 3 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast