Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Rodrigo Cisneros Durán

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1934Born
17 Jul 195723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ambato, Ecuador
1 Dec 196733.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
1 Dec 196733.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
7 Jan 196833.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
4 Jul 196935.3AppointedBishop of Ambato, Ecuador
15 Feb 200065.9AppointedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
20 Apr 200975.1RetiredArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
29 Dec 201783.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Vicente Rodrigo Cisneros Durán (VIAF: 88695808)
Archbishop Vicente Rodrigo Cisneros Durán (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePelileo (Tungurahua)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ambato, Diocese of Ambato
Death PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 149, Number 1
  • d: CB, 30 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast