Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Chiarinelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1935Born
15 Sep 195722.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 198347.8AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
27 Feb 198347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
27 Mar 199358.0AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
30 Jun 199762.2AppointedBishop of Viterbo, Italy
11 Dec 201075.7RetiredBishop of Viterbo, Italy
3 Aug 202085.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Chiarinelli
Bishop Lorenzo Chiarinelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcerviano
Ordained BishopSts. Camille et Rufus, Cathedral, Rieti, Diocese of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)
Death PlaceRieti, Diocese of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 3 Aug 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,736

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast