Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Louis Marie Charrier

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1938 Born
6 Oct 196325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
29 Jun 196425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
22 Jan 200162.4AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
22 Apr 200162.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
12 Dec 201375.3RetiredBishop of Tulle, France
6 Apr 201778.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Aire et Dax, France
17 Dec 201779.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Louis Marie Charrier
Bishop Bernard Louis Marie Charrier (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained DeaconGrand Séminaire, Chapel, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained PriestSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained Bishopl`Espace des Trois Provinces, Brive-la-Gaillarde

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tulle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,964
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2017
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast