Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John of the Cross Chang-yik

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1933Born
30 Mar 196329.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 199460.9AppointedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
14 Dec 199461.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
2006¹72.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng, Korea (North)
2010²76.1RetiredApostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng, Korea (North)
28 Jan 201076.1RetiredBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
5 Aug 202086.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John of the Cross Chang-yik
Bishop John of the Cross Chang-yik (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ch’unch’ŏn, Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn
Death PlaceCh’unch’ŏn, Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Crypt, Cathedral, Ch’unch’ŏn, Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,532
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 6 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast