Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hamhŭng

Dioecesis Hameungensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Wonsan
5 August 1920ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Seul Vicariate Apostolic of Wonsan (erected)
9 July 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Wonsan Mission "Sui Iuris" of Ilan (erected)
19 July 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Wonsan Prefecture Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji] (erected)
12 January 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Wonsan Territorial Abbey of Tokugen o Tokwon (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kanko o Hamheung
12 January 1940Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Wonsan Vicariate Apostolic of Kanko o Hamheung
Vicariate Apostolic of Hamheung
12 July 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kanko o Hamheung Vicariate Apostolic of Hamheung
Diocese of Hamhŭng
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hamheung Diocese of Hamhŭng

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hamhŭng
196024,996800,0003.1%52227925391613ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast