Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Danilo Catarzi, S.X. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1918Born
29 Jun 194325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
16 Apr 196244.1AppointedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Jul 196244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Mar 198163.1ResignedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Nov 200486.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Danilo Catarzi
Bishop Danilo Catarzi S.X. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uvira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucciano di Quarrata, Italy

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 99
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast