Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cerilo "Allan" Uy Casicas

Bishop of Marbel, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1967 Born
27 Oct 199427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Marbel, Philippines
28 Apr 201851.1AppointedBishop of Marbel, Philippines
11 Jul 201851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marbel, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cerilo "Allan" Uy Casicas
Bishop Cerilo "Allan" Uy Casicas (born ) Bishop of Marbel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuero, Bohol, Territorial Prelature of Marbel
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Koronadal, Diocese of Marbel

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marbel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2018
  • mn: CB, 28 Apr 2018
  • mn: CB, 9 May 2018
  • ob: CB, 23 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 31 May 2018
  • c3: CB, 11 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast