Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Miguel Castaño Fonseca

Bishop of Azcapotzalco, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1962 Born
19 Mar 198724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
22 Jun 201047.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
22 Jun 201047.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vadesi
30 Jul 201047.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vadesi
28 Sep 201957.0AppointedBishop of Azcapotzalco, México, México
7 Nov 201957.1InstalledBishop of Azcapotzalco, México, México

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Miguel Castaño Fonseca
Bishop Adolfo Miguel Castaño Fonseca (born ) Bishop of Azcapotzalco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Mateo Mozoquilpan, Diocese of Toluca, México
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Azcapotzalco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,769
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2019
  • i: CB, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast