Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Casale

Archbishop Emeritus of Foggia-Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1923 Born
3 Feb 194622.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 197451.0AppointedBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
8 Dec 197451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
7 May 198864.6AppointedArchbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy
27 May 199975.6RetiredArchbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Casale
Archbishop Giuseppe Casale (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Foggia-Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrani
Ordained BishopSan Pantaleone, Church, Vallo della Lucania, Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast