Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Aloysius Carrell, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1803Born
20 Dec 182724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
1835²31.5EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Jul 185350.1AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
1 Nov 185350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
25 Sep 186865.2DiedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Aloysius Carrell
Bishop George Aloysius Carrell S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA, Diocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestSt. Augustine, Church, Philadelphia, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Death PlaceCovington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary (8th St.), Cathedral, Covington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky
Buried Place (Current)St. Mary, Cemetery, Fort Mitchell, KY, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast