Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silviano Carrillo y Cárdenas

Deceased

Bishop of Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1861Born
26 Dec 188423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
30 Jul 192059.2AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
24 Feb 192159.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
19 Mar 192159.8InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
10 Sep 192160.3DiedBishop of Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Silviano Carrillo y Cárdenas
Bishop Silviano Carrillo y Cárdenas (born , died ) Bishop of Sinaloa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePátzcuaro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Death PlaceCuliacán, Diocese of Sinaloa

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast