Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Casado Obispo, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Barata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1886Born
29 Jan 191225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Mar 193649.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam
9 Mar 193649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Barata
2 Aug 193649.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barata
19 Jan 194154.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Thái Binh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Juan Casado Obispo
Bishop Juan Casado Obispo O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Thái Binh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuentecén, Spain
Ordained BishopThai Bonh

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast