Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ángel Cadenas Cardo, O.S.A.

Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1965 Born
12 Oct 198519.9Temporary VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
5 May 199125.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
22 Nov 199227.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of St. Augustine
27 Nov 199328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
15 May 202155.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
18 Jul 202155.7Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ángel Cadenas Cardo
Bishop Miguel Ángel Cadenas Cardo O.S.A. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaguna de Negrillos, Diocese of León, Spain
Ordained DeaconNuestra Señora de la Consolación, Church, Mostoles
Ordained BishopCentral Courtyard, Colegio San Agustín, Iquitos, Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2021
  • temp/od/c01: CB, 15 May 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast