Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Draper Byrne

Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1964 Born
25 Jun 199429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
14 Oct 202056.0AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
14 Dec 202056.2Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for William Draper Byrne
Bishop William Draper Byrne (born ) Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral, Springfield, Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2020
  • ob/mn/c1: CB, 14 Oct 2020
  • c2: CB, 1 Nov 2020
  • c34: CB, 5 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast