Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Javier Buhain, Jr.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manila, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Bacanaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1937 Born
21 Dec 196023.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 198345.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
5 Jan 198345.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bacanaria
21 Feb 198345.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bacanaria
23 Sep 200366.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Javier Buhain, Jr.
Bishop Teodoro Javier Buhain, Jr. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacoor
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Manila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 4 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast