Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ljudevit Lajčo Budanović

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Bačka, Serbia

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1873Born
24 Jun 189724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
Feb 1923³49.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Bačka, Serbia
28 Feb 192753.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
1 May 192754.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
16 Mar 195884.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Bačka, Serbia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ljudevit Lajčo Budanović
Bishop Ljudevit Lajčo Budanović (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Bačka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBajmak
Ordained BishopSvete Terezije Avilske, Church, Subotica, Apostolic Administration of Jugoslavenska Bačka

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,803
  • name: CB, 21 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast