Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Antoine Étienne Marie Bozo

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1966 Born
20 Jun 199327.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sées {Séez}, France
3 Jul 199428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sées {Séez}, France
11 May 201751.1AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
3 Sep 201751.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine Étienne Marie Bozo (VIAF: 17145243776774441750)
Bishop Pierre-Antoine Étienne Marie Bozo (born ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArgentan, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame de l'Assomption, Church, Vimoutiers, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Sées, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limoges.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,514
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast