Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Vitale Bommarco, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1923Born
8 Sep 194016.9Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Oct 194522.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Dec 194926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 May 197248.6AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
11 Nov 198259.1AppointedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
11 Nov 198259.1CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
6 Jan 198359.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
6 Feb 198359.3InstalledArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
2 Jun 199975.6RetiredArchbishop of Gorizia, Italy
16 Jul 200480.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gorizia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vitale Bommarco
Archbishop Antonio Vitale Bommarco O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCres
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Archbishop's Crypt, Cathedral, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • temp/loc: CB, 9 May 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast