Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bilsborrow

Deceased

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1836Born
26 Feb 186528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
15 Jul 189256.2AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
24 Aug 189256.4Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
5 Mar 190366.9DiedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Bilsborrow (VIAF: 316388646)
Bishop John Bilsborrow (born , died ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSingleton Lodge, Kirkham, Preston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edward, College, Everton, Liverpool, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlaceBabbacombe, Torquay, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Moston, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492
  • c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 53
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,054

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast