Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denys Raboula Antoine Beylouni

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Mardin dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1930 Born
17 Oct 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
12 Jul 198352.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
12 Jul 198352.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mardin dei Siri
18 Dec 198353.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mardin dei Siri
1 Jun 199160.8AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
16 Sep 200070.1ResignedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
16 Sep 200070.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mardin dei Siri
16 Sep 200070.1AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 Mar 201180.5ResignedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Denys Raboula Antoine Beylouni
Archbishop Denys Raboula Antoine Beylouni (born ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChayah
Ordained BishopAnnunciation, Cathedral, Beirut, Eparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,989

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast