Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youhanna Jihad Mtanos Battah

Archbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1956 Born
19 May 199134.8Ordained PriestPriest of Damas (Syrian), Syria
1 Mar 201154.6AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 Mar 201154.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Phaena
20 May 201154.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phaena
22 Jun 201962.9AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
27 Jul 201963.0InstalledArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Jihad Mtanos Battah
Archbishop Youhanna Jihad Mtanos Battah (born ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,060
  • fn: CB, 16 Apr 2018
  • ab: CB, 22 Jun 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2019
  • i: CB, 28 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast