Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iwannis Louis Awad

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Venezuela (Syrian)

Titular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1934Born
8 Dec 195723.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 200369.0AppointedApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Syrian)
17 May 200369.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
12 Sep 200369.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
1 Mar 201176.8RetiredApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Syrian)
18 Nov 202086.5DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Venezuela (Syrian)

MicroData Summary for Iwannis Louis Awad
Bishop Iwannis Louis Awad (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaidal, Syria
Ordained BishopChurch, Zeidal
Death PlaceHoms, Archdiocese of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,462
  • d: CB, 18 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 19 Nov 2020

Quantcast