Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Ashe

Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Muteci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1953 Born
11 Jun 197824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
14 May 202167.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
14 May 202167.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Muteci
31 Jul 202167.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muteci

MicroData Summary for Martin Ashe
Bishop Martin Ashe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinsale, Co. Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestCollege of All Hallows, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2021
  • ob: AM, 2 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast