Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Alfonso Belloso y Sánchez

Deceased

Archbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1873Born
18 Dec 189724.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
18 Dec 191946.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
18 Dec 191946.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
30 May 192046.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
22 Dec 192754.1AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
9 Aug 193864.7DiedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Alfonso Belloso y Sánchez
Archbishop José Alfonso Belloso y Sánchez (born , died ) Archbishop of San Salvador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast