Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władysław Bandurski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1865Born
24 Jul 188722.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
10 Oct 190641.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
10 Oct 190641.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
30 Dec 190641.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
16 Apr 191751.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
6 Mar 193266.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Władysław Bandurski
Bishop Władysław Bandurski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSokal
Ordained BishopLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,807
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 109
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast