Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcísio Sebastião Batista Lopes, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1938Born
20 Mar 196022.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Jun 196426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Apr 198446.2AppointedBishop of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
14 May 198446.3Ordained BishopBishop of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
19 Dec 198648.9AppointedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
29 Jul 199860.5ResignedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
7 Nov 200163.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tarcísio Sebastião Batista Lopes
Bishop Tarcísio Sebastião Batista Lopes O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ipameri

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Rosário, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast