Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bai Ningxian

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1921 Born
20 Jun 195130.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 199776.2Ordained BishopBishop

MicroData Summary for John Bai Ningxian
Bishop John Bai Ningxian (born ) Bishop

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 7 Jan 2021

Quantcast